US HB3459 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires projects under various federal programs to use materials manufactured in the United States, with exceptions. The bill applies to materials such as steel, plastic, concrete, and glass and applies to programs for broadband infrastructure, water treatment, health centers, and housing, among others.
Title
Made in America Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Maritime Security. |
2019-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2019-07-23 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7227-7229) |
2019-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-07-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Energy and Commerce, Financial Services, Homeland Security, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1955 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Building construction
Buy American requirements
Economic development
Educational technology and distance education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Metals
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Buy American requirements
Economic development
Educational technology and distance education
Employment and training programs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Government operations and politics
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Housing and community development funding
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Internet and video services
Land use and conservation
Manufacturing
Metals
Public contracts and procurement
Public housing
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3459/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3459/BILLS-116hr3459ih.pdf |