US HB344 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competitive Health Insurance Act - Amends the McCarran-Ferguson Act to provide that nothing in that Act shall modify, impair, or supersede the operation of any of the antitrust laws with respect to the business of health insurance. Applies prohibitions against using unfair methods of competition to the business of health insurance without regard to whether such business is carried on for profit.
Title
Competitive Health Insurance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB99 (Related) 2013-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB743 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB911 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
HB743 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB911 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB3121 (Related) 2014-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/344/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr344/BILLS-113hr344ih.pdf |