US HB3404 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the establishment in the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration of a Highly Automated Vehicle Advisory Council. This bill directs the Department of Transportation (DOT) to establish in the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration a Highly Automated Vehicle Advisory Council to undertake information gathering activities, develop technical advice, and present best practices or recommendations to DOT regarding: labor and employment issues that may be affected by the deployment of highly automated vehicles; the impact of the development and deployment of such vehicles on the environment; protection of consumer privacy and security of information collected by such vehicles; and cabin safety for vehicle passengers and how automated driving systems may impact collision vectors, overall crashworthiness, and the use and placement of airbags, seatbelts, anchor belts, head restraints, and other protective features in the cabin. A "highly automated vehicle" is defined as a motor vehicle (excluding a commercial motor vehicle) equipped with an automated driving system. An "automated driving system" is defined as the hardware and software that are collectively capable of performing the entire dynamic driving task on a sustained basis, regardless of whether such system is limited to a specific operational design domain.
Title
To provide for the establishment in the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration of a Highly Automated Vehicle Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection. |
2017-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3411 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3413 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3414 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3416 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3388 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3413 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3414 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3416 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3388 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Computers and information technology
Consumer affairs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Right of privacy
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3404/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3404/BILLS-115hr3404ih.pdf |