US HB3388 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
SELF DRIVE Act Safely Ensuring Lives Future Deployment and Research In Vehicle Evolution Act This bill establishes the federal role in ensuring the safety of highly automated vehicles by encouraging the testing and deployment of such vehicles. A "highly automated vehicle" is a motor vehicle, other than a commercial motor vehicle, that is equipped with an automated driving system capable of performing the entire dynamic driving task on a sustained basis. The bill preempts states from enacting laws regarding the design, construction, or performance of highly automated vehicles or automated driving systems unless such laws enact standards identical to federal standards. The Department of Transportation (DOT) must require safety assessment certifications for the development of a highly automated vehicle or an automated driving system. Manufacturers of highly automated vehicles must develop written cybersecurity and privacy plans for such vehicles prior to offering them for sale. The bill applies certain safety exemptions and testing standards to highly automated vehicles. DOT must: (1) inform prospective buyers of highly automated vehicles of the capabilities and limitations of such vehicles; (2) establish the Highly Automated Vehicle Advisory Council to, among other things, develop guidance regarding mobility access for the disabled, elderly, and underserved populations; (3) require all new passenger motor vehicles less than 10,000 pounds to be equipped with a rear seat occupant alert system; and (4) research updated safety standards for motor vehicle headlamps.
Title
SELF DRIVE Act Safely Ensuring Lives Future Deployment and Research In Vehicle Evolution Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2017-09-06 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6667-6671) |
2017-09-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3388. |
2017-09-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6660-6667, H6677-6678) |
2017-09-06 | House | Mr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 212. |
2017-09-05 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-294. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 0. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3406 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3421 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3401 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3405 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3407 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3408 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3412 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3404 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3411 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3413 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3414 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3416 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3421 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3401 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3405 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3407 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3408 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3412 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3404 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3411 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
HB3413 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3414 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3416 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2017-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Aging
Air quality
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Disability and paralysis
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal preemption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Public transit
Research and development
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Trade restrictions
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Advisory bodies
Aging
Air quality
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Disability and paralysis
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal preemption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Motor vehicles
Product safety and quality
Public transit
Research and development
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Trade restrictions
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security