US HB3360 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cruise Vessel Security and Safety Act of 2010 - (Sec. 3) Delineates passenger vessel security and safety requirements concerning: (1) vessel design, equipment, construction, and retrofitting; (2) video surveillance to monitor crime; (3) access to security guide; (4) posting of U.S. embassy locations; (5) maintenance of equipment, medications, and medical personnel for sexual assaults on board; (6) confidentiality of sexual assault information; (7) restrictions on crew access to passenger staterooms; and (8) log book entry and reporting of deaths, missing individuals, thefts, and other crimes. Prescribes civil and criminal penalties for persons who willfully violate such requirements. Directs the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating to develop minimum training standards for the certification of passenger vessel security personnel, crew members, and law enforcement officials on methods for the prevention, detection, evidence preservation, and reporting of criminal activities in the international maritime environment. Prohibits a vessel carrying U.S. citizens from entering a U.S. port unless there is at least one crew member on board who has met such training and certification requirements. Subjects persons who violate such requirements to certain civil penalties. (Sec. 4) Repeals certain maritime reporting requirements. Requires the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard (CG) is operating to combine into a single annual report for FY2010 and thereafter the separate reports of the CG concerning: (1) its annual fisheries enforcement plans; and (2) steps it will take to improve significantly the detection and interdiction of illegal incursions by foreign fishing vessels into the U.S. exclusive economic zone.
Title
Cruise Vessel Security and Safety Act of 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Became Public Law No: 111-207. | |
2010-07-27 | Signed by President. | |
2010-07-19 | Presented to President. | |
2010-06-30 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-06-30 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-06-30 | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5262-5265) | |
2010-06-30 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3360. | |
2010-06-30 | Mr. Cummings moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5262-5267) | |
2010-06-11 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-06-10 | S.AMDT.4339 Amendment SA 4339 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-06-10 | S.AMDT.4339 Amendment SA 4339 proposed by Senator Dorgan for Senator Rockefeller. (consideration: CR S4865-4866)In the nature of a substitute. | |
2010-06-10 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4865-4866) | |
2009-11-18 | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 211. | |
2009-11-17 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-17 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 4 (Roll no. 892). (text: CR H13020-13023) | |
2009-11-17 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H13033) | |
2009-11-17 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-11-17 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3360. | |
2009-11-17 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13020-13026) | |
2009-11-17 | Mr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-11-07 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190. | |
2009-11-07 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-332. | |
2009-07-30 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-07-30 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-07-30 | Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged. | |
2009-07-29 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. | |
2009-07-28 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1485 (Related) 2009-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB3619 (Related) 2010-10-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-281.
SB588 (Related) 2009-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
HCR289 (Related) 2010-07-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB3619 (Related) 2010-10-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-281.
SB588 (Related) 2009-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 156.
HCR289 (Related) 2010-07-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Coast guard
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Evidence and witnesses
Health personnel
Internet and video services
Law enforcement officers
Marine and inland water transportation
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Business records
Coast guard
Consumer affairs
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Evidence and witnesses
Health personnel
Internet and video services
Law enforcement officers
Marine and inland water transportation
Right of privacy
Sex offenses
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism