US HB3356 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes certain veterans eligible for the Transportation Security Administration PreCheck Program at no cost if they meet the program's background check and security requirements. Veterans who are eligible for this fee waiver are those who have been determined by the Department of Veterans Affairs to have incurred permanent blindness, or those who have been determined to require the use of a wheelchair, prosthetic limb, or other assistive device to aid with mobility due to (1) loss, or loss of use, of a limb; or (2) full or partial paralyzation.
Title
VETS Safe Travel Act Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 160. |
2019-09-12 | House | Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. |
2019-09-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-203, Part I. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1881 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Transportation safety and security
Veterans' pensions and compensation