US HB3326 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
World Bank Accountability Act of 2017 This bill provides that for each of FY2018-FY2023, 15% of appropriations for the World Bank's International Development Association shall be withheld and not disbursed until the Department of the Treasury reports to Congress that the International Bank for Reconstruction and Development: (1) is implementing institutional incentives that prioritize poverty reduction, development outcomes, and capable project management over the Bank's lending and grant making volume; (2) is taking, or has completed, steps to address the management failures from the Uganda Transport Sector Development Project; and (3) is strengthening its trust fund management in order to increase accountability for poverty reduction and development outcomes. An additional 15% of appropriations for such fiscal years shall be withheld and not disbursed until Treasury reports that the International Bank for Reconstruction and Development: (1) is emphasizing its support for secure property rights, due process of law, and economic freedom as essential to sustained poverty reduction in World Bank borrowing countries; (2) has not approved any loans or grants to a country designated by the U.S. as a state sponsor of terrorism and is strengthening the ability of Bank-funded projects to undermine violent extremism; (3) is taking steps to conduct randomized forensic audits of projects receiving Bank assistance; and (4) is working to detect and minimize corruption in projects involving development policy lending. Such conditions will be considered to have been satisfied for a fiscal year if they have been satisfied for the preceding three fiscal years. The bill amends the International Development Association Act to authorize the Governor of the International Development Association to contribute a specified amount on behalf of the United States to the 18th replenishment of the association's resources.
Title
World Bank Accountability Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A002) H.Amdt.512 RC# 23 (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - On passage RC# 24 (Y: 237 N: 184 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - On passage RC# 24 (Y: 237 N: 184 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-17 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 237 - 184 (Roll no. 24). |
2018-01-17 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H448-449) |
2018-01-17 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-01-17 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 3326. |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.512 On agreeing to the Connolly amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 420 - 0 (Roll no. 23). |
2018-01-17 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of an amendment which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2018-01-17 | House | The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration. |
2018-01-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H452-454) |
2018-01-17 | House | Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 3326 as unfinished business. |
2018-01-17 | House | On motion that the Committee rise Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-01-17 | House | Mr. Hensarling moved that the Committee rise. |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.513 On agreeing to the Barr amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 693, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Barr amendment No. 3. |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.513 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Barr. (consideration: CR H451-452; text: CR H451) |
2018-01-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Connolly amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Connolly demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 693, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Connolly amendment No. 2. |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.512 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Connolly. (consideration: CR H450-451, H452-453; text: CR H450) |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.511 On agreeing to the Norman amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2018-01-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 693, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Norman amendment No. 1. |
2018-01-17 | House | H.Amdt.511 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Norman. (consideration: CR H449-450; text: CR H449) |
2018-01-17 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 3326. |
2018-01-17 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable John J. Duncan, Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2018-01-17 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 693 and Rule XVIII. |
2018-01-17 | House | The rule provides for one hour of general debate on both measures. Only those amendments printed in Part A of the report shall be considered for H.R. 3326. The amendment printed in Part B of the report, relating to H.R. 2954, shall be considered as adopted. The rule allows for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both measures. |
2018-01-17 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 693. (consideration: CR H440-452) |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 693 Reported to House. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on both measures. Only those amendments printed in Part A of the report shall be considered for H.R. 3326. The amendment printed in Part B of the report, relating to H.R. 2954, shall be considered as adopted. The rule allows for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both measures. |
2017-09-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214. |
2017-09-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-298. |
2017-07-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0. |
2017-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR693 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Due process and equal protection
Economic development
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Political movements and philosophies
Property rights
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Due process and equal protection
Economic development
Foreign loans and debt
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Political movements and philosophies
Property rights
Rule of law and government transparency
Terrorism