US HB3324 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the authority to collect Shasta-Trinity Marina fees through fiscal year 2029.
Title
To extend the authority to collect Shasta-Trinity Marina fees through fiscal year 2029.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 387 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2023-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-09-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 387). |
2023-09-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3324. |
2023-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-09-12 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 151. |
2023-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-188. |
2023-06-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-06-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3046 (Related) 2023-12-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.