US HB3318 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Transportation to repay the credit risk premiums paid with respect to certain railroad infrastructure loans after the obligations attached to such loans have been satisfied.
Title
Railroad Rehabilitation and Improvement Financing Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB1818 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1818 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3318/BILLS-117hr3318ih.pdf |