US SB1818 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Department of Transportation to refund credit risk premiums under the Railroad Rehabilitation and Improvement Financing loan program upon the satisfaction of a loan's obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad Rehabilitation and Improvement Financing Equity Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3684 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-58. (TXT | PDF)
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3318 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback