US HB3299 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Internal Revenue Code to apply the requirement for a health plan to provide dependent coverage until an adult child turns 26 years of age to plans that do not have any participants who are current employees (retiree-only plans).
Title
To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act to apply to retiree-only health plans the extension of dependent health coverage for individuals through 26 years of age provided for by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions. |
2011-11-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-11-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-11-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Employee benefits and pensions
Family relationships
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Family relationships
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3299/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3299/BILLS-112hr3299ih.pdf |