US HB3285 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend gendered terms in Federal law relating to the President and the President's spouse.
Title
21st Century President Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-272. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9610) |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-06-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5700) |
2022-06-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3285. |
2022-06-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5700-5701) |
2022-06-21 | House | Mr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 291. |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-380. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |