US HB326 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 111-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 111-66.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cocopah Lands Act - Requires the Secretary of the Interior, if the Cocopah Indian Tribe of Arizona transfers title to certain described land to the Secretary, to take it into trust for the benefit of the Tribe, if there are no recognized environmental conditions or contamination related concerns and no adverse legal claims to such land. Considers such land to be part of the Tribe's initial reservation. Designates Yuma county, Arizona, as the Tribe's service area for the delivery of federal services to enrolled Tribe members. Prohibits using the trust land for gaming under the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act.
Title
Cocopah Lands Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 111-66. | |
2009-03-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. | |
2009-03-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-03-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2878-2879) | |
2009-03-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 326. | |
2009-03-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2878-2879) | |
2009-03-02 | Mr. Holt moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Arizona
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans