US HB3250 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
9/11 Immigrant Worker Freedom Act This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to adjust to permanent resident the status a qualifying alien who applies for adjustment not later than one year after enactment of this bill and who, after the September 11, 2011, terrorist attacks: worked or volunteered on site in rescue, recovery, debris cleanup, or related support services in lower Manhattan, the Staten Island Landfill, or the barge loading piers for a specified number of hours during certain periods between September 11, 2001, and July 31, 2002; was a vehicle-maintenance worker who was exposed to debris from the former World Trade Center while retrieving, driving, cleaning, repairing, and maintaining vehicles contaminated by airborne toxins for any time during such period; or was a member of a fire or police department, worked for a recovery or cleanup contractor, or was a volunteer and performed rescue, recovery, demolition, debris cleanup, or other related services at the Pentagon site during the period between September 11, 2001, and November 19, 2001, or at the Shanksville, Pennsylvania, site during the period between September 11, 2001-October 3, 2001. DHS may authorize an alien who has applied for adjustment of status under this bill to work during the pendency of his or her application.
Title
9/11 Immigrant Worker Freedom Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Defense
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign labor
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement officers
Motor vehicles
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
Terrorism
Virginia
Worker safety and health
Department of Defense
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Foreign labor
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Law enforcement officers
Motor vehicles
New York City
Pennsylvania
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
Terrorism
Virginia
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3250/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3250/BILLS-115hr3250ih.pdf |