US HB3245 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the White County Bridge Commission to convey to the New Harmony River Bridge Authority and the New Harmony and Wabash River Bridge Authority, all right, title, and interest of the commission in and to the bridge and the approaches thereto across the Wabash River at or near New Harmony, Indiana, and in land underneath or adjacent to such bridge and its approaches. The Act of April 12, 1941, (creating the commission) is repealed effective on the date that the commission completes such conveyance.
Title
Restore the Harmony Way Bridge Act
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-56. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-08-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-08-13 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5217) |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7290) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3245. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7290-7291) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1833 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-64.