US HB3242 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to improve the American History for Freedom grant program.
Title
USA Civics Act of 2021 Understanding and Studying American Civics Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-05-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1814 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB879 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4384 (Related) 2022-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4403 (Related) 2022-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB879 (Related) 2021-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4384 (Related) 2022-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4403 (Related) 2022-06-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3242/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3242/BILLS-117hr3242ih.pdf |