US HB3226 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Prematurity Research Expansion and Education for Mothers who deliver Infants Early Act.
Title
PREEMIE Reauthorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC] |
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275. |
2023-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6799) |
2023-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3226. |
2023-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6799-6800) |
2023-12-11 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-08-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 130. |
2023-08-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-164. |
2023-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 0. |
2023-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 0 . |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1573 (Related) 2023-10-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223.