US HB322 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EPIC Act End Pensions in Congress Act This bill amends the Civil Service Retirement System (CSRS) and the Federal Employees' Retirement System (FERS) to exclude Members of Congress, except the Vice President, from further CSRS and FERS retirement coverage. The bill prohibits further government contributions or deductions from such Member's basic pay for deposit in the Treasury to the credit of the Civil Service Retirement and Disability Fund. Nothing in this bill shall: (1) be considered to nullify, modify, or otherwise affect any right, entitlement, or benefit under CSRS or FERS for any Member covering any period before enactment of this bill; or (2) affect the eligibility of a Member to participate in the Thrift Savings Plan in accordance with otherwise applicable law. Members covered by such exclusion, within 90 days after enactment of this bill, may elect to remain subject to CSRS or FERS, as the case may be.
Title
EPIC Act End Pensions in Congress Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB145 (Related) 2017-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB1935 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4981 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1935 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4981 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/322/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr322/BILLS-115hr322ih.pdf |