US HB1935 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congressional Pension Reform Act This bill modifies the Federal Employees Retirement System (FERS) to exclude Members of Congress, except the Vice President, from FERS retirement coverage after the enactment of this bill. The bill prohibits further government contributions or deductions from a Member's basic pay for deposit in the Treasury to the credit of the Civil Service Retirement and Disability Fund. The bill does not affect the rights or benefits of any Member for the period prior to the enactment of this bill, nor does it affect the eligibility of a member to participate in the Thrift Savings Plan. Members may elect to remain subject to FERS by filing a written election within 90 days after the enactment of this bill.
Title
Congressional Pension Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB145 (Related) 2017-01-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB322 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4981 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB322 (Related) 2017-01-05 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4981 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1935/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1935/BILLS-115hr1935ih.pdf |