US HB3199 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Access to Higher Education Act of 2017
Title
Improving Access to Higher Education Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1772 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2782 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1295 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2138 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HB2782 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1295 (Related) 2017-06-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2138 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Computers and information technology
Disability and health-based discrimination
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Judicial procedure and administration
Student records
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Computers and information technology
Disability and health-based discrimination
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education programs funding
Educational technology and distance education
Government information and archives
Higher education
Judicial procedure and administration
Student records
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3199/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3199/BILLS-115hr3199ih.pdf |