US HB3197 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical center in Spokane, Washington, as the "Mann-Grandstaff Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center."
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs medical center in Spokane, Washington, as the "Mann-Grandstaff Department of Veterans Affairs Medical Center".
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Norman Dicks [D-WA] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] |
Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 421 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 421 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 421 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2012-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 1 (Roll no. 646). (text: CR 12/19/2012 H7330) |
2012-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7413-7414) |
2012-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Michaud objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3197. |
2012-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7330-7331) |
2012-12-19 | House | Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-10-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-10-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1705 (Related) 2012-06-27 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Washington State
Congressional tributes
Health facilities and institutions
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Washington State