US HB3154 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits federal mortgage providers from limiting insurance eligibility on the basis of the mortgagor's participation in the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals Program.
Title
Homeownership for DREAMers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155. |
2019-09-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-197. |
2019-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 25. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3154 (Related) 2019-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
SB1929 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1929 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing and community development
Housing discrimination
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Immigration status and procedures
Housing and community development
Housing discrimination
Housing finance and home ownership
Housing industry and standards
Immigration status and procedures