US HB3119 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Department of Energy Organization Act with respect to functions assigned to Assistant Secretaries, and for other purposes.
Title
Energy Emergency Leadership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3638) |
2021-07-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3119. |
2021-07-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3638-3639) |
2021-07-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 68. |
2021-07-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-94. |
2021-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Subcommittee on Energy Discharged. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2302 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.