US HB3071 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Acquisition Savings Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires: (1) each executive agency to consider equipment rental in any cost-effectiveness analysis for equipment acquisition; and (2) the Government Accountability Office, within two years, to report on decisions of the agencies with the highest levels of acquisition spending, and of a sample of agencies with lower levels of such spending, to acquire high-value equipment by lease, rental, or purchase.
Title
Federal Acquisition Savings Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-13 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 624 (Y: 396 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 624). (text: CR H9143) |
2017-11-13 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9157) |
2017-11-13 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3071. |
2017-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9143-9145) |
2017-11-13 | House | Mr. Hice, Jody B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 296. |
2017-11-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-402. |
2017-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3251 (Related) 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement