US SB3251 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Acquisition Savings Act of 2018
Title
Federal Acquisition Savings Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 669. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-383. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3071 (Related) 2017-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.