US HB3030 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-36)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018 This bill states that it is U.S. policy to regard the prevention of genocide and other atrocity crimes as a core national security interest and a core moral responsibility. The President shall instruct the Department of State to establish a Mass Atrocities Task Force to strengthen State Department efforts and assist other agency efforts at atrocity prevention and response. The Foreign Service Act of 1980 is amended to provide for the training of Foreign Service Officers in conflict and atrocity crimes prevention. The Director of National Intelligence is encouraged to include in his or her annual testimony to Congress on threats to U.S. national security: (1) a review of countries and regions at risk of atrocity crimes; and (2) specific countries and regions at immediate risk of atrocity crimes, including most likely pathways to violence, specific risk factors, potential perpetrators, and at-risk target groups. The bill establishes the Complex Crises Fund to enable the State Department and the U.S. Agency for International Development to support programs and activities to prevent or respond to emerging or unforeseen foreign challenges and complex crises overseas, including potential atrocity crimes. Fund amounts may not be expended for lethal assistance or to respond to natural disasters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

Sponsors

Rep. Ann Wagner [R]Rep. Randy Weber [R]Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. Luke Messer [R]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. James McGovern [D]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Joseph Crowley [D]Rep. Charlie Crist [D]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D]Rep. Brad Sherman [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Danny Davis [D]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]
Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. David Cicilline [D]
Rep. James Himes [D]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Michael Capuano [D]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]
Rep. Robert Latta [R]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Mike Quigley [D]
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]Rep. Tom Emmer [R]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D]Rep. Karen Bass [D]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]Rep. Bobby Rush [D]
Rep. Donald Payne [D]Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D]Rep. Paul Cook [R]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D]Rep. Robin Kelly [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D]Rep. Michael Doyle [D]Rep. Albio Sires [D]Rep. Ann Kuster [D]
Rep. Frank Pallone [D]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D]Rep. Val Demings [D]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D]
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. Don Beyer [D]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]Rep. Neal Dunn [R]Rep. Donald Norcross [D]Rep. Sander Levin [D]
Rep. David Kustoff [R]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]Rep. Juan Vargas [D]Rep. Jose Serrano [D]
Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. Dennis Ross [R]Rep. John Yarmuth [D]
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]Rep. Chris Stewart [R]Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R]Rep. Michael McCaul [R]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]Rep. John Curtis [R]Rep. Lou Barletta [R]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D]Rep. Jim Costa [D]Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]
Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Lois Frankel [D]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Edward Royce [R]

Roll Calls

2018-07-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 334 (Y: 406 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
2018-07-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 5 (Roll no. 334). (text: CR H6315-6316)
2018-07-17HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6343-6344)
2018-07-17HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-07-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3030.
2018-07-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6315-6319)
2018-07-17HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-05-17HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
2018-05-17HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2018-05-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-05-10HouseSubcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged.
2017-09-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
2017-06-28HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5238-5239)
2017-06-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-06-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-06-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1158 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 489.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback