US SB1158 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-6-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018 This bill states that it is U.S. policy to regard the prevention of genocide and other atrocity crimes as a core national security interest and a core moral responsibility. The President shall instruct the Department of State to establish a Mass Atrocities Task Force to strengthen State Department efforts and assist other agency efforts at atrocity prevention and response. The Foreign Service Act of 1980 is amended to provide for the training of Foreign Service Officers in conflict and atrocity crimes prevention. The Director of National Intelligence is encouraged to include in his or her annual testimony to Congress on threats to U.S. national security: (1) a review of countries and regions at risk of atrocity crimes; and (2) specific countries and regions at immediate risk of atrocity crimes, including most likely pathways to violence, specific risk factors, potential perpetrators, and at-risk target groups. The bill establishes the Complex Crises Fund to enable the State Department and the U.S. Agency for International Development to support programs and activities to prevent or respond to emerging or unforeseen foreign challenges and complex crises overseas, including potential atrocity crimes. Fund amounts may not be expended for lethal assistance or to respond to natural disasters.
Title
Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 489 (Y: 367 N: 4 NV: 61 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 4 (Roll no. 489). (text: CR H10546-10547) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10574-10575) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1158. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10546-10547) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-13 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-13 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-13 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.4102 Amendment SA 4102 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | S.Amdt.4102 Amendment SA 4102 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S7523-7524; text: CR S7523) To make technical corrections. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7522) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7522-7524) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 489. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3014-3015) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3030 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity