US HB3014 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program within the Department of Defense (DOD) to grant money to certain small businesses and modifies provisions related to DOD funding of small businesses through Small Business Administration programs. Specifically, the bill creates the Domestic Investment Pilot Program, which allows DOD and service acquisition executives for each military department to make a Small Business Innovation Research (SBIR) program award to small businesses that are majority-owned by multiple domestic venture investors. However, no more than 15% of DOD SBIR funds may be awarded to such small businesses. In addition, the bill doubles funding for the Defense Research and Development Rapid Innovation Program, which is a competitive, merit-based program designed to accelerate the deployment of technologies developed through SBIR projects. The bill also allows DOD to award Small Business Technology Transfer (STTR) program funds to accelerate the creation of small businesses and the commercialization of research innovations. Further, the bill authorizes discretionary technical and business assistance through the SBIR and STTR programs for the purpose of aiding small businesses with cybersecurity decision-making, problem-solving, and development and commercialization of new products and processes. Lastly, DOD, in consultation with the military departments, must establish at least three joint reserve detachments at locations of the Defense Innovation Unit to (1) support engagement and collaboration with commercial innovation hubs, and (2) accelerate the transition and adoption of commercial technologies for national security purposes.
Title
Accelerating Defense Innovation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] |
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Small Business Administration
Technology transfer and commercialization
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Small Business Administration
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3014/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3014/BILLS-116hr3014ih.pdf |