US HR476 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2500) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2020 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2500) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2020 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2500) to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2020 for military activities of the Department of Defense and for military construction, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 436 (Y: 234 N: 197 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - On agreeing to the McGovern amendment (A001) H.Amdt.506 RC# 435 (Y: 234 N: 197 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - House - On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) H.Amdt.506 RC# 434 (Y: 232 N: 197 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-10HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 234 - 197 (Roll no. 436). (text: CR H5314-5315)
2019-07-10HouseH.Amdt.506 On agreeing to the McGovern amendment (A001) Agreed to by recorded vote: 234 - 197 (Roll no. 435).
2019-07-10HouseH.Amdt.506 On ordering the previous question on the amendment (A001) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 197 (Roll no. 434). (consideration: CR H5323, H5334)
2019-07-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5334-5336)
2019-07-10HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 476, the question was put on ordering the previous question on the McGovern amendment and on the resolution and by voice vote, the Chair announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
2019-07-10HouseH.Amdt.506 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McGovern. (consideration: CR H5323, H5334-5335; text: CR H5323)
2019-07-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 476.
2019-07-10HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5314-5323)
2019-07-09HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 35.
2019-07-09HouseThe resolution provides for a motion to suspend the rules relating to H.R. 1327 on the legislative days of July 11, 2019, or July 12, 2019.
2019-07-09HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-143, by Mr. McGovern.

Same As/Similar To

HB553 (Related) 2019-07-12 - Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 1.
HB1327 (Related) 2019-07-17 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 153.
HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback