US HB3008 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA), if the White Lotus Foundation in Santa Barbara, California, offers to convey to the Secretary a parcel of non-federal land that is acceptable to the Secretary and the Secretary accepts the offer, to convey approximately five acres of certain identified National Forest System land in Santa Barbara County to the Foundation. Subjects the land exchange to provisions under the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976 related to exchanges of public lands and interests therein within the National Forest System. Expresses the intent of Congress that the land exchange be completed within two years of enactment of this Act. Allows the Secretary to offer to sell to the White Lotus Foundation the federal land for fair market value if such exchange is not completed by such time. Makes the land exchange and any such sale subject to specified additional terms and conditions, including to valid existing rights and the White Lotus Foundation paying the reasonable costs of surveys, appraisals, and other administrative costs associated with the exchange or sale. Requires land conveyed by exchange or sale under this Act to be appraised by an independent appraiser selected by the Secretary and such an appraisal to be conducted in accordance with nationally recognized appraisal standards.
Title
To provide for the conveyance of a small parcel of National Forest System land in Los Padres National Forest in California, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 367 N: 27 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-01-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 27 (Roll no. 25). (text: CR H1258) |
2014-01-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1260-1261) |
2014-01-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-01-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3008. |
2014-01-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1258-1259) |
2014-01-27 | House | Mrs. Lummis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213. |
2013-12-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-295. |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-11-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-14 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |