US HB3007 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Aviation Administration Veterans' Preference Protection Act This bill applies federal veterans' preference provisions for filling a position in the competitive service and remedies for violations of such provisions to the personnel management system of the Federal Aviation Administration.
Title
Federal Aviation Administration Veterans' Preference Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB2800 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB2800 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Department of Transportation
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3007/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3007/BILLS-115hr3007ih.pdf |