US HB2905 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Justice for Victims of IRS Scams and Identity Theft Act of 2018 This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish procedures to expedite the review of, and seek an indictment in, any case involving identity theft or aggravated identity theft by an individual who impersonates an employee or officer of the Internal Revenue Service. DOJ must submit to Congress and publish a report that contains certain information on the status of prosecutions for such offenses.
Title
Justice for Victims of IRS Scams and Identity Theft Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 147 (Y: 403 N: 3 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-04-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 3 (Roll no. 147). |
2018-04-18 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3429-3430) |
2018-04-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2905. |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3356-3359; text: CR H3356) |
2018-04-17 | House | Mr. Poe (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers