US HB2876 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STORIS Act Ships to be Recycled in the States Act This bill requires the Department of Transportation (DOT), in coordination with the Department of the Navy, to report to Congress on the program for disposal of government-owned merchant vessels as well as on any other disposal of obsolete government-owned vessels. The Government Accountability Office shall audit all excess federal government vessel sales contracts, including resulting receivables and expenditures, entered into by the Maritime Administration during a specified period. The bill repeals authority to scrap any vessel sold from the National Defense Reserve Fleet in an approved foreign market without obtaining additional separate DOT approval to transfer the vessel to a person not a U.S. citizen. The Floyd D. Spence National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2001 is amended to revise requirements for the selection of qualified scrapping facilities. The Toxic Substances Control Act is amended to declare that nothing in the mandate for the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to regulate polychlorinated biphenyls (PCBs) shall be construed to prohibit the dismantling of a vessel or marine structure in order to recycle recovered materials. If PCBs are found or suspected, the person dismantling the vessel or marine structure must comply with specified requirements for informing the EPA and disposing of the PCBs. The bill repeals authorization for any foreign country to apply for an obsolete vessel to be used for an artificial reef. The Maritime Administration shall make public on its website the full text of each memorandum of agreement and similar agreement between the Maritime Administration and any other agency, department, or person.
Title
STORIS Act Ships to be Recycled in the States Act
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces. |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1511 (Related) 2015-06-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historic sites and heritage areas
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Historic sites and heritage areas
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2876/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2876/BILLS-114hr2876ih.pdf |