US HB2866 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 188-105-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 350,000 $1 silver coins, and 300,000 half-dollar clad coins to commemorate the centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town. Requires the design of the coins to be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest nonprofit child care agencies in the United States. Permits issuance of such coins only between January 1, 2017, and December 31, 2017. Subjects all coin sales to specified surcharges, which shall be paid to the Treasury for the purposes of reducing the national debt. Directs the Secretary to ensure that: (1) minting and issuing such coins will not result in any net cost to the federal government; and (2) no funds, including surcharges, will be disbursed to Boys Town until the total cost of designing and issuing all authorized coins is recovered by the Treasury.
Title
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | S.AMDT.4120 Amendment SA 4120 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | S.AMDT.4120 Amendment SA 4120 proposed by Senator Walsh for Senator Johanns. (consideration: CR S6867; text: CR S6867)To provide that surcharges received from the sale of coins under the Act are used to reduce the national debt. |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6867) |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2014-09-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-09-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7506-7507) |
2014-09-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2866. |
2014-09-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7506-7508) |
2014-09-15 | House | Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1011 (Same As) 2013-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations