US HB2859 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to extend the 6% interest rate limitation on debt entered into during a servicemember's military service to any debt entered into to consolidate or refinance one or more student loans incurred before such service.
Title
To amend the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act to extend the interest rate limitation on debt entered into during military service to debt incurred during military service to consolidate or refinance student loans incurred before military service.
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1399 (Same As) 2013-10-30 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-280.
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1982 (Related) 2014-02-27 - S.AMDT.2766 SA 2766 fell when SA 2747 fell. (consideration: CR S1210)
SB2413 (Related) 2014-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Government lending and loan guarantees
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Government lending and loan guarantees
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2859/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2859/BILLS-113hr2859ih.pdf |