US HB2820 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the cancellation of removal and adjustment of status of certain individuals who are long-term United States residents and entered the United States as children, and for other purposes.
Title
Dream Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 73. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-98. |
2019-05-22 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 10. |
2019-05-22 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2821 (Related) 2019-05-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
HB6 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
SB874 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 112.
SB874 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR415 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Military personnel and dependents
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Vocational and technical education
Administrative remedies
Citizenship and naturalization
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judicial review and appeals
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Lawyers and legal services
Legal fees and court costs
Military personnel and dependents
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Vocational and technical education