US HB2818 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to establish a grant program for States to offset incremental rate increases paid by low-income households resulting from the implementation of infrastructure programs that are designed to accelerate the necessary replacement, repair, or maintenance of natural gas distribution systems, and for other purposes.
Title
Mitigate Methane Now Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2818/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2818/BILLS-117hr2818ih.pdf |