US HB2812 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Securities and Exchange Commission to carry out a study of the costs associated with small- and medium-sized companies to undertake initial public offerings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Middle Market IPO Cost Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 246 (Y: 390 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2023-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-06-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 10 (Roll no. 246).
2023-06-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business.
2023-06-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2023-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2812.
2023-06-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2023-06-05HouseMrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2023-06-05HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 68.
2023-06-05HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-91.
2023-04-26HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 0.
2023-04-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-04-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2023-04-25HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback