US HB2809 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize an electronic health record modernization program of the Department of Veterans Affairs and increase oversight and accountability of the program to better serve veterans, medical professionals of the Department, and taxpayers, and for other purposes.
Title
EHR Program RESET Act of 2023 Electronic Health Record Program Restructure, Enhance, Strengthen, and Empower Technology Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] |
Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Scott Franklin [R-FL] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] | Rep. Matt Rosendale [R-MT] |
Rep. Christopher Deluzio [D-PA] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Nikki Budzinski [D-IL] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1659 (Related) 2023-07-19 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
SB1125 (Same As) 2023-07-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-217.
SB1125 (Same As) 2023-07-12 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-217.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2809/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2809/BILLS-118hr2809ih.pdf |