US HB2803 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017 This bill sets forth a variety of measures to address the prevention and punishment of human trafficking and to assist trafficking victims. Included among these are provisions concerning: restitution for victims; funding of investigations of offenses relating to sexual abuse of children; grants to states and localities and other entities for victim service assistance; training of health, victim service, and federal law enforcement personnel, including through the use of a victim screening protocol by the Department of Homeland Security; penalties imposed for slavery offenses, sex trafficking of children, and repeat convictions for transportation for illegal sexual activity and related crimes; travel for the purpose of engaging in any illicit sexual conduct; designation of additional Department of Justice resources for prosecution and service coordination; penalties for offenses involving organized human trafficking, sexual abuse, sexual exploitation, or transportation for prostitution or any illegal sexual activity; and studies of the physical and psychological effects of serious harm to victims.
Title
Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2017-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1311 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - Signed by President.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Debt collection
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical education
Medical research
Mental health
Organized crime
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Travel and tourism
Youth employment and child labor
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Debt collection
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical education
Medical research
Mental health
Organized crime
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Travel and tourism
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2803/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2803/BILLS-115hr2803ih.pdf |