US SB1311 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017 This bill sets forth a variety of measures to address the prevention and punishment of human trafficking and to assist trafficking victims. Included among these are provisions concerning: restitution for victims; funding of investigations of offenses relating to sexual abuse of children; grants to states and localities and other entities for victim service assistance; training of health, victim service, and federal law enforcement personnel, including through the use of a victim screening protocol by the Department of Homeland Security; penalties imposed for slavery offenses, sex trafficking of children, and repeat convictions for transportation for illegal sexual activity and related crimes; travel for the purpose of engaging in any illicit sexual conduct; designation of additional Department of Justice resources for prosecution and service coordination; penalties for offenses involving organized human trafficking, sexual abuse, sexual exploitation, or transportation for prostitution or any illegal sexual activity; and studies of the physical and psychological effects of serious harm to victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2018-09-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-28HouseOn passage Passed without objection.
2018-09-28HouseH.Amdt.975 On agreeing to the Marino amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-28HouseH.Amdt.975 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Marino. (consideration: CR H9377-9381; text: CR H9377-9381)
2018-09-28HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9373-9381; text of measure as introduced: CR H9373-9377)
2018-09-28HouseMr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Homeland Security discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2017-09-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-09-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
2017-09-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-09-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
2017-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-12HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-09-12HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-09-12HouseReceived in the House.
2017-09-11SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5175-5179)
2017-09-11SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
2017-09-11SenateS.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2017-09-11SenateS.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S5174-5175; text: CR S5174-5175) To improve the bill.
2017-09-11SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5170-5179)
2017-08-01SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188.
2017-08-01SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2017-06-29SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2017-06-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3331-3335)

Same As/Similar To

HB2803 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1517 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3304 (Related) 2017-08-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB1236 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Accounting and auditing
Advisory bodies
Appropriations
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Debt collection
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Human trafficking
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical education
Medical research
Mental health
Organized crime
Sex offenses
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Travel and tourism
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback