US HB2794 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the protection of the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness and interconnected Federal lands and waters, including Voyageurs National Park, within the Rainy River Watershed in the State of Minnesota, and for other purposes.
Title
Boundary Waters Wilderness Protection and Pollution Prevention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 457. |
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-634. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 16. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2022-05-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |