US HB2766 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filipino Veterans Fairness Act of 2015 Deems certain service performed before July 1, 1946, in the organized military forces of the Philippines and the Philippine Scouts as active military service for purposes of eligibility for veterans' benefits through the Department of Veterans Affairs. Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, in determining eligibility under this Act, to take into account any relevant service documentation, including documentation other than the Missouri List (the list of all discharged and deceased veterans from the 20th century).
Title
Filipino Veterans Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-06-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3003 (Related) 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Philippines
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Asia
Philippines
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2766/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2766/BILLS-114hr2766ih.pdf |