US HB2729 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 87-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To immediately resume construction of the border wall system along the international border between the United States and Mexico to secure the border, enforce the rule of law, and expend appropriated funds as mandated by Congress, and for other purposes.
Title
Finish the Wall Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4828 (Related) 2021-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB4518 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB6637 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SB4518 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2729/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2729/BILLS-117hr2729ih.pdf |