US HB2682 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 158-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defund Obamacare Act of 2013 - Prohibits any federal funds from being made available to carry out the provisions of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or the health care provisions of the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010. Prohibits any entitlement to benefits under such provisions from remaining in effect on and after the date of the enactment of this Act. Prohibits any payments from being awarded, owed, or made to any state, district, or territory under any such provision. Rescinds any unobligated balances available under such provisions.
Title
Defund Obamacare Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2013-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1292 (Same As) 2013-07-16 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 135.
Subjects
Appropriations
Comprehensive health care
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Comprehensive health care
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2682/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2682/BILLS-113hr2682ih.pdf |