US HB2666 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Rate Regulation of Broadband Internet Access Act t (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) from regulating the rates charged for broadband Internet access service. (Sec. 3) Nothing in this Act shall be construed to affect the FCC's authority to: (1) condition receipt of universal service support by a provider of broadband Internet access service on the regulation of the rates charged by such provider for the supported service, or (2) enforce regulations relating to truth-in-billing requirements or paid prioritization. (Sec. 4) Broadband Internet access service shall not be construed to include data roaming or interconnection for purposes of this Act.
Title
No Rate Regulation of Broadband Internet Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] |
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - House - On Passage (Y: 241 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 173 N: 231 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 179 N: 231 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 173 N: 231 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - On Agreeing to the Amendment (Y: 179 N: 231 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 431. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-15 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 241 - 173 (Roll no. 152). |
2016-04-15 | House | Point of order sustained against the motion to recommit with instructions. |
2016-04-15 | House | Mr. Walden raised a point of order against the motion to recommit with instructions. Mr. Walden stated that the provisions of the amendment were not germane to the bill. Sustained by the Chair. |
2016-04-15 | House | Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on Yarmuth motion to recommit with instructions, pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment providing for consideration of H. Con. Res. 125, establishing the congressional budget for the United States Government for FY 2017. |
2016-04-15 | House | Mr. Yarmuth moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H1753; text: CR H1753) |
2016-04-15 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H1748-1749) |
2016-04-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1753) |
2016-04-15 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2666. |
2016-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.975 On agreeing to the McNerney amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 173 - 231 (Roll no. 151). |
2016-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.974 On agreeing to the Yarmuth amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 179 - 231 (Roll no. 150). |
2016-04-15 | House | UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed. |
2016-04-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the McNerney amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes prevailed. Mr. McNerney demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day. |
2016-04-15 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 672, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McNerney amendment no. 3. |
2016-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.975 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. McNerney. (consideration: CR H1750-1751, H1752; text: CR H1750) |
2016-04-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Yarmuth amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes prevailed. Mr. Yarmuth demanded a recorded vote, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day. |
2016-04-15 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 672, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Yarmuth amendment no. 2. |
2016-04-15 | House | H.Amdt.974 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Yarmuth. (consideration: CR H1749-1750, H1751-1752; text: CR H1749) |
2016-04-15 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2666. |
2016-04-15 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable John J. Duncan, Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2016-04-15 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 672 and Rule XVIII. |
2016-04-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2666 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. |
2016-04-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 672. (consideration: CR H1741-1754) |
2016-04-13 | House | Rule H. Res. 672 passed House. |
2016-04-12 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 672 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2666 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364. |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-478. |
2016-03-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 19. |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 15 - 11 . |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2283 (Related) 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-401. Additional views filed.
HR672 (Related) 2016-04-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR672 (Related) 2016-04-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Telecommunication rates and fees