US HB2662 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring Accountability in the Indian Health Service Act of 2017
Title
Restoring Accountability in the Indian Health Service Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1250 (Same As) 2018-04-11 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
HB5874 (Related) 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 872.
HB5874 (Related) 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 872.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Historical and cultural resources
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Minority health
Native Americans
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Employee hiring
Employee performance
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Historical and cultural resources
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Licensing and registrations
Medical education
Minority health
Native Americans
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2662/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2662/BILLS-115hr2662ih.pdf |