US HB262 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the imposition of the death penalty for any violation of Federal law, and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Death Penalty Prohibition Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB582 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1030)
SB582 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1030)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/262/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr262/BILLS-117hr262ih.pdf |