US HB97 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the imposition of a death penalty sentence for a violation of federal law. It eliminates statutory authority for the death penalty as a sentencing option for federal offenses. It also requires a person who was sentenced to death before enactment of this bill to be resentenced.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Death Penalty Abolition Act of 2021

Sponsors

Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-04HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB262 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB582 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1030)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback