US HB2615 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-224. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-3-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-224. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act (Sec. 2) This bill establishes the Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission to carry out activities to commemorate the 100th anniversary of the date the U.S. Virgin Islands became an unincorporated U.S. territory. (Sec. 7) The Commission shall report annually to the President and Congress on Commission revenue and expenditures, including a list of each gift, bequest, or devise worth more than $250, and the identity of the donor. (Sec. 8) The Inspector General of the Department of the Interior may audit the Commission, making the results available to Congress and the public. (Sec. 10) The Commission shall terminate on September 30, 2018, or at an earlier date determined by the Commission after submitting its final report to Congress. (Sec. 11) No federal funds are authorized or may be obligated to carry out this Act.
Title
Virgin Islands of the United States Centennial Commission Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-224. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-09-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5911) |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 586. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 07/14/2016 without amendment. With written report No. 114-314. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1979-1980) |
2016-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615. |
2016-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1979-1981) |
2016-04-26 | House | Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 370. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 114-486. |
2016-03-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3905) |
2015-06-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2015-06-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Commemorative events and holidays
Government operations and politics
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Commemorative events and holidays
Government operations and politics
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands